Jackson et al v. Department of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Howard G Jackson, Jr, Liz Moore, Howard G Jackson, Sr and Howard G. Jackson, Sr
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Tina Smith, Melissa Hortman, Public Housing - GRH Housing - HUD Housing, St. Paul Police Department, Jamie Becker Finn, Ryan Winkler, Liz Olson, Department of Human Services and Amy Klobuchar
Case Number: 0:2019cv01429
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT/Proof Doc #1-6 re #10 MOTION to Amend Defendants filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr.(MMG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Defendants filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr. (MMG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMEND PROOF TO CASE by Howard G Jackson, Jr (CLK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr.(MMG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr. (MMG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Howard G Jackson, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Howard G Jackson, Jr (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MMG) Document QC'd on 7/1/2019 (JGK).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE For Answers And Demand to Stop Corrupted Me Again Notice to Sue St.Paul and Ramsey County And State of MN filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr (MMG) Document QC'd on 6/27/2019 (JGK).
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Appeal to Block and Motion to Appeal Eviction H.S.D filed by Howard G Jackson, Jr. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Howard G Jackson, Sr, Howard G Jackson, Jr, Liz Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamie Becker Finn, Department of Human Services, Department of Public Safety, Melissa Hortman, Amy Klobuchar, Liz Olson, Public Housing - GRH Housing - HUD Housing, Tina Smith, St. Paul Police Department, Ryan Winkler filed by Liz Moore, Howard G Jackson, Sr, Howard G Jackson, Jr. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) cc:Jackson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Housing - GRH Housing - HUD Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Becker Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Klobuchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G Jackson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G Jackson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G. Jackson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?