Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE, Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. and MNDKK, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01433
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Great Lakes Insurance SE waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Lulic, Joseph) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (MMP).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/18/2019. (CLG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Certified-Return Receipt on Great Lakes Insurance Acknowledgement filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company re #8 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Stipulation of Dismissal, (Kuderer, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Jointly Signed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurane Company and Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc.. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Kuderer, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc., Great Lakes Insurance SE, MNDKK, LLC. (CLK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1433 PJS/LIB. (CLK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. (Kuderer, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Kuderer on behalf of Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. (Kuderer, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6905486) filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kuderer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dingmann Brothers Construction of Richmond, Inc.
Represented By: John Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNDKK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Kuderer
Represented By: Gregory E Kuderer
Represented By: Thomas C Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?