Richardson v. BPL Plasma, Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin L. Richardson
Defendant: BPL Plasma, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01472
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Justin L. Richardson. BPL Plasma, Inc. waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Raukar, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on BPL Plasma, Inc. on 06/06/2019, filed by Justin L. Richardson. (Raukar, Peter)
June 6, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BPL Plasma, Inc.. (kt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1472 WMW/TNL. (kt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BPL Plasma, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6919031) filed by Justin L. Richardson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Raukar, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. BPL Plasma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin L. Richardson
Represented By: Peter J Raukar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPL Plasma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?