County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc. v. Alexandria Motels, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.
Defendant: Vibha Patel, Alexandria Motels, Inc., Lake Country Motels, LLC and Jaimini Patel
Case Number: 0:2019cv01485
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alexandria Motels, Inc., Lake Country Motels, LLC, Jaimini Patel, Vibha Patel. (Foss, Sean)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #11 Stipulation - Alexandria Motels, Inc. answer due 7/10/2019; Lake Country Motels, LLC answer due 7/10/2019; Jaimini Patel answer due 7/10/2019; Vibha Patel answer due 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/26/2019. (JLB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension to Answer Complaint by Alexandria Motels, Inc., Lake Country Motels, LLC, Jaimini Patel, Vibha Patel. Jointly Signed by Craig Miller. (Foss, Sean)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean T Foss on behalf of All Defendants. (Foss, Sean)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. Jaimini Patel served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Miller, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. Vibha Patel served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Miller, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. Lake Country Motels, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Miller, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. Alexandria Motels, Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Miller, Craig)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Miller, Craig)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alexandria Motels, Inc., Lake Country Motels, LLC, Jaimini Patel, Vibha Patel. (CLK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (6th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1485 JNE/LIB. (CLK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Country is a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Radisson Hospitality, Inc. (formerly known as Carlson Hotels, Inc. and formerly known as Carlson Hotels 2 Worldwide, Inc.), a Minnesota corporation. Radisson Hospitality, Inc. is a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Aplite Holdings AB, organized under the laws of Sweden (Aplite), which is a majority-owned subsidiary of Jinjiang International Holdings Co., Ltd., (Jinjiang), organized under the laws of the People's Republic of China, which is wholly-owned by the Shanghai State-Owned Assets Supervision and Administration Commission of the State Council, an agency of the Peoples Republic of China (SSASAC). (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (kt).
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6921378) filed by County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc. v. Alexandria Motels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vibha Patel
Represented By: Sean T Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Motels, Inc.
Represented By: Sean T Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Country Motels, LLC
Represented By: Sean T Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimini Patel
Represented By: Sean T Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Inn & Suites By Radisson, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk W Reilly
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Represented By: Olivia Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?