Max Blu Technologies, LLC v. Microboards Technology LLC
Plaintiff: Max Blu Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Microboards Technology LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01486
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Microboards Technology LLC answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/31/2019. (KLL)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed filed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonough, James)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Microboards Technology LLC answer due 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/28/2019. (JMK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(McDonough, James)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James F McDonough, III for Max Blu Technologies, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/19/2019. (NAH)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. McDonough, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6945217 filed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Regan, Anne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. Microboards Technology LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Regan, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Intelleq Holdings, LLC as corporate parent of Max Blue Technologies, LLC. (Regan, Anne) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (kt).
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Regan, Anne)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing James F. McDonough, III, Jonathan R. Miller, Travis E. Lynch as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (ACH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Microboards Technology LLC. (ACH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1486 JRT/HB. (ACH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microboards Technology LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6921539) filed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Regan, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Max Blu Technologies, LLC v. Microboards Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Blu Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: James F McDonough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microboards Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?