Sela v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Amit Sela
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Case Number: 0:2019cv01488
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Amit Sela. Jointly Signed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina.(Sauro, Brenda)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Selective Insurance Group, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Lulic, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Moreland Cooper on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Cooper, Olivia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K Brownson on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Brownson, Kristi)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/9/2019. (JMK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina . (Lulic, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Compliance re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued byAmit Sela. (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Lulic, Joseph)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (LPH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1488 JNE/HB. (LPH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Bergstrom on behalf of Amit Sela. (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-6921839) filed by Amit Sela. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bergstrom, Adina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sela v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Sela
Represented By: Adina R Bergstrom
Represented By: Brenda M Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Kristi K Brownson
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?