Bowden v. Marques
Petitioner: Kenneth D. Bowden
Respondent: R. Marques
Case Number: 0:2019cv01510
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth D. Bowden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/18/2019. (JRE) cc: Kenneth D. Bowden. Modified text on 7/19/2019 (MMP).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Kenneth D. Bowden (notice and practice pointers). Modified text on 6/11/2019 (MMP).
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth D. Bowden re #2 Letter, #3 Memorandum, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM Of Law In Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth D. Bowden.(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER TO THE COURT re: $5.00 filing fee (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641103455) filed by Kenneth D. Bowden. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) cc:Bowden (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden v. Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Marques
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth D. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?