Cyprian v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Renita Cyprian
Defendant: 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01525
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated. (Schroeder, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated. (Schroeder, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bank of America N.A.,corporate parent of is Bank of America Corporation which is a publicly held corporation.Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Bank of Corporation. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP).
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Bank of America N.A. answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (HAM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America N.A.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Renita Cyprian. (Schroeder, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renita Cyprian. 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renita Cyprian. Bank of America N.A. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated, Bank of America N.A. (CLK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1525 PJS/TNL. (CLK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated, Bank of America NA (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6928284) filed by Renita Cyprian. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyprian v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renita Cyprian
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11th Hour Recovery, Incorporated
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?