EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company and Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Defendant: Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01547
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. response to Complaint due 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/22/2019. (TMA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Clayton, Lucas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Carstensen Contracting, Inc.. Jointly Signed by EMCASCO Insurance Company and Employers Mutual Casualty. (Clayton, Lucas)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. answer or otherwise response due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/1/2019. (TMA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Clayton, Lucas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Carstensen Contracting, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Carstensen Contracting, Inc. and EMCASCO Insurance Company and Employers Mutual Casualty. (Clayton, Lucas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Wood on behalf of EMCASCO Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Wood, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMCASCO Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company. Carstensen Contracting, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (De Medeiros, Joao)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carstensen Contracting, Inc. (KDS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 0:19-cv-01547 NEB/ECW. (KDS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff EMCASCO Insurance Company is a subsidiary of EMC Insurance Group Inc., which is a publicly traded company. No other publicly traded company owns 10% or more of EMCASCO Insurance Companys stock. Plaintiff Employers Mutual Casualty Company does not have any parent corporation and no publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. (De Medeiros, Joao) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (KDS). Modified text on 6/12/2019 (lmb).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Carstensen Contracting, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6933171) filed by EMCASCO Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Redacted CGL Policy, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Redacted Umbrella Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (De Medeiros, Joao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carstensen Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Dean B Thomson
Represented By: Lucas Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?