Saunders v. Warden, FCI-Sandstone
Petitioner: Andre Saunders
Respondent: Warden, FCI-Sandstone
Case Number: 0:2019cv01551
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Warden, FCI-Sandstone re #11 Declaration, #10 Response (Blumenfield, Chad)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Michael Gyurke Jr. re #10 Response by Warden, FCI-Sandstone . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Blumenfield, Chad)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Warden, FCI-Sandstone. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blumenfield, Chad)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the petition. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/22/2019. (TJB) cc:Andre Saunders. Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MMG).
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Warden, FCI-Sandstone re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, , #7 Proposed Order to Judge (Blumenfield, Chad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Warden, FCI-Sandstone.(Blumenfield, Chad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Warden, FCI-Sandstone. (Blumenfield, Chad)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Warden, FCI-Sandstone. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/21/2019. (TJB) cc:Andre Saunders. Modified text on 6/24/2019 (MMG).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Saunders. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Andre Saunders. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Saunders. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) cc: Saunders (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Warden, FCI-Sandstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI-Sandstone
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?