NDGS, LLC v. Radium2 Capital, Inc.
Plaintiff: NDGS, LLC
Defendant: Radium2 Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01554
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Duane Johnson in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case filed by NDGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Wentzell, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case filed by NDGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wentzell, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Due to the pending motion, there is good cause to delay setting a pretrial conference at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/23/2019. (MSK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Rubis, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc..(Rubis, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 re #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 5, #5 Exhibit(s) 6, #6 Exhibit(s) 7, #7 Exhibit(s) 8)(Rubis, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rubis, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MISSING COURTROOM NUMBER-INSTRUCTED TO REFILE. NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case: Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Rubis, Bethany) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (lmb).
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue or Stay Case filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc. (Rubis, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Radium2 Capital, Inc.. filed by NDGS, LLC. No summons requested. (Wentzell, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski for Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (NAH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shanna Kaminski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6992783 filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing)(Rubis, Bethany)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by NDGS, LLC re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Wentzell, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Radium2 Capital, Inc. (MMP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1554 (SRN/BRT). (MMP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Wentzell, Joseph) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (MMP).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff NDGS, LLC. (Wentzell, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Radium2 Capital, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6935069) filed by NDGS, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Wentzell, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NDGS, LLC v. Radium2 Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NDGS, LLC
Represented By: James W Moen
Represented By: Joseph A Wentzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radium2 Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Shanna M. Kaminski
Represented By: Bethany Jean Rubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?