Wattleton v. Doe
Plaintiff: David Earl Wattleton
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 0:2019cv01558
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs: Scanned envelope back. (KMH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David Earl Wattleton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/24/2019 (KMH).
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint: scanned in envelope back. (KMH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David Earl Wattleton - Plaintiff David Earl Wattleton must within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order file a certified copy of his prison trust-fund-account statement; and if Wattleton does not file this within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, his request to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis will be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/1/2019. (JLB) cc: Wattleton. Modified text on 7/2/2019 (KDS).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David Earl Wattleton. (ACH) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against John Doe filed by David Earl Wattleton. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (ACH) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (ACH). cc: David Earl Wattleton Modified file date on 6/19/2019 (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #3 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wattleton v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Earl Wattleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?