Thompson v. Hussain et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Thompson
Defendant: Mend Correctional Care, Patrick Carr, Joel Blott, Sherburne County Jail Staff, Janell Hussain, Mend Medical Services and Diana VanDerBeek
Case Number: 0:2019cv01559
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ryan Thompson filed by Ryan Thompson.(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/9/2019 (MKB).
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ryan Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/9/2019 (MKB).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ryan Thompson. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/30/2019. (MME) cc: Ryan Thompson. Modified text on 7/30/2019 (lmb).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/22/2019. (DLO) cc: Ryan Thompson. Modified text on 7/23/2019 (MMP).
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint: scanned in missing "Appeal to Grievance #100795" exhibit. (KMH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Ryan Thompson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan Thompson re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ryan Thompson, #3 MOTION For Judgment (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION For Judgment filed by Ryan Thompson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ryan Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Joel Blott, Patrick Carr, Janell Hussain, Mend Correctional Care, Mend Medical Services, Sherburne County Jail Staff, Diana VanDerBeek filed by Ryan Thompson. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) cc:Thompson (MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #4 Scanned in Exhibit Re: #100795) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Hussain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mend Correctional Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Blott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mend Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana VanDerBeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?