Feygin v. Total Renal Research, Inc.

Plaintiff: Julia Feygin
Defendant: Total Renal Research, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01565
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/8/2019. (HAM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 5/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 11/15/2020. Ready for trial due by 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/8/2019. (HAM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/8/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Total Renal Research, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Julia Feygin.(Kettelkamp, Brent)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Total Renal Research, Inc.. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1565 ECT/TNL. (CLK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Total Renal Research, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, (Kettelkamp, Brent)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Total Renal Research, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Total Renal Care, Inc. Total Renal Care, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of DaVita Inc. DaVita Inc. is a public company, with Berkshire Hathaway Inc. owning more than 10% of DaVita Inc.s common stock.) is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Total Renal Research, Inc.. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6936754) filed by Total Renal Research, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kettelkamp, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feygin v. Total Renal Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Renal Research, Inc.
Represented By: Brent D Kettelkamp
Represented By: Cynthia A Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Feygin
Represented By: Dustin W Massie
Represented By: Christopher D Jozwiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?