Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BI-LO HOLDINGS, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. and Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.
Defendant: JBS USA FOOD COMPANY HOLDINGS, SEABOARD CORPORATION, CLEMENS FOOD GROUP, LLC, AGRI STATS, INC., HORMEL FOODS, LLC, TRIUMPH FOODS, LLC, TYSON PREPARED FOODS, INC., SEABOARD FOODS LLC, MITSUBISHI CORPORATION (AMERICAS), JBS USA FOOD COMPANY, INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION, SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC., THE CLEMENS FAMILY CORPORATION, HORMEL FOODS CORPORATION, TYSON FOODS, INC., TYSON FRESH MEATS, INC. and Clemens Family Corporation, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv01578
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore B Bell on behalf of Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Bell, Theodore)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Ahern on behalf of Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Ahern, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Anderson on behalf of Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Anderson, James)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1578 (JRT/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/20/2019 and Wilhelmina M. Wright on 6/21/2019. (MMP)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Ahern for Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC and for Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Theodore B Bell for Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC and for Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/19/2019. (NAH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore B. Bell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6947298 filed by Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Anderson, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. Ahern. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6947258 filed by Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Anderson, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Patrick J. Ahern, Theodore B. Bell as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (ACH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (ACH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, The, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Indiana Packers Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Mitsubishi Corporation (Americas), Seaboard Corporation. (ACH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Securities & Antitrust list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1578 WMW/HB. (ACH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6940040) filed by BI-LO HOLDINGS, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI-LO HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: James W Anderson
Represented By: Theodore B Bell
Represented By: Patrick Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Represented By: James W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winn Dixie Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore B Bell
Represented By: James W Anderson
Represented By: Patrick Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA FOOD COMPANY HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEABOARD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEMENS FOOD GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRI STATS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORMEL FOODS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIUMPH FOODS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON PREPARED FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEABOARD FOODS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUBISHI CORPORATION (AMERICAS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA FOOD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CLEMENS FAMILY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORMEL FOODS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON FRESH MEATS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Family Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?