Johnson v. Rental History Reports et al
Plaintiff: Ida Johnson
Defendant: Jeffery Peckham, Rental History Reports and Julie Ann Daniels
Case Number: 0:2019cv01583
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/26/2020. Motions (disp) due by 11/30/2020. Ready for trial due by 3/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/20/2019. (KAT) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (ACH).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/20/2019. (KAT)
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT)
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Ida Johnson. Jointly Signed by Defendant Jeffrey Peckham, Defendant Julie Ann Daniels, and Defendant Rental History Reports.(Albanese, John)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the passing of Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: the new case number is 0:19-cv-01583-JNE-KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT)
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Baggio on behalf of Rental History Reports. (Baggio, Alexander)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Rental History Reports ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham. filed by Rental History Reports. (Berhow, Mark)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-only) ORDER on #16 Stipulation. Rental History Reports answer due 9/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/3/2019. (MME)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 Daniels/Peckham's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Rental History Reports. filed by Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham. (Kiedrowski, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Eidsness, Kyle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time for Rental History Reports to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Rental History Reports. Jointly Signed by Ida Johnson. (Eidsness, Kyle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Alan Eidsness on behalf of Rental History Reports. (Eidsness, Kyle)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Rental History Reports, filed by Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham. (Kiedrowski, Michael) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (lmb). Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MKB).
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ida Johnson. Rental History Reports served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Albanese, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I Kiedrowski on behalf of Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham. (Kiedrowski, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham. Julie Ann Daniels waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Jeffery Peckham waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Kiedrowski, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Rental History Reports. (MMP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Rental History Reports. (Albanese, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not re-sent to Rental History Reports re #7 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service. (lmb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Rental History Reports, Jeffery Peckham, and Julie Ann Daniels. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 8/1/2019. (kt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Ida Johnson re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: John Albanese. (MMP) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (MMP).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/21/2019. (MME) cc: John G Albanese. Modified text on 6/24/2019 (MMP).
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Dekovich on behalf of Ida Johnson. (Dekovich, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1583 JNE/SER. (CLK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ida Johnson. (Albanese, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julie Ann Daniels, Jeffery Peckham, Rental History Reports filed by Ida Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Albanese, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Rental History Reports et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Peckham
Represented By: Michael I Kiedrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rental History Reports
Represented By: Kyle Alan Eidsness
Represented By: Mark T Berhow
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ann Daniels
Represented By: Michael I Kiedrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Dekovich
Represented By: John G Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?