Terning v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Terning
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01584
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: The Pretrial Conference is rescheduled from 08/30/2019 to 9/10/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/23/2019. (MSK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Angell, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order FILED IN ERROR/WILL BE RE-FFILED. ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/18/2019. (MSK) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (MMG).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Lindsay M. Keller as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1584 MJD/BRT. (kt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6942111) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service by Mail, #3 Cover Letter Letter serving Answer, Notice of Removal, et al, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Angell, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terning v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher G Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Terning
Represented By: Paul A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?