Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited v. C.H. Robinson International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited a/s/o Marina Bay Sands PTE Ltd. and Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited
Defendant: C.H. Robinson International, Inc. d/b/a CHRistal Lines and C.H. Robinson International, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01589
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Pryor on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Pryor, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., trading under the symbol CHRW. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Pryor, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A). (Pryor, Mark) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (lmb).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Chubb Limited (a NYSE listed company) which is a publicly traded company. (Toder, Brian) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (lmb).
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Toder, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (MMG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1589 PJS/TNL. (MMG) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMG).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.H. Robinson International, Inc.(filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6942814) filed by Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Toder, Brian) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited v. C.H. Robinson International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Robinson International, Inc. d/b/a CHRistal Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Robinson International, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited a/s/o Marina Bay Sands PTE Ltd.
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Insurance Hong Kong Limited
Represented By: Brian N Toder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?