Foss v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Foss
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corp. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01591
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Myers, Gregory)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/22/2019. (TJB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Nicole Foss. (Myers, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Home Point Capital Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Home Point Financial Corp.. (Anderson, Keith)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Home Point Financial Corp.. (Anderson, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/1/2019. (TJB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Nicole Foss. (Myers, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Home Point Financial Corp. answer due 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/21/2019. (TJB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Home Point Financial Corp. re #3 Stipulation (Anderson, Keith)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Home Point Financial Corp.. Jointly Signed by Nicole Foss. (Anderson, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1591 (WMW/DTS). (KNK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6943005) filed by Home Point Financial Corp.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Consent, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foss v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corp.
Represented By: Keith S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Foss
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?