Steele v. City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Adam Steele
Defendant: City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota and Other Unnamed Persons and Entities
Case Number: 0:2019cv01620
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Steele re #15 Amended Complaint byAdam Steele. (Steele, Adam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Adam Steele. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, 2, & 3) (Steele, Adam) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (MMP).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re [Docket No. #6 ] Report and Recommendation. (1) Steele's motion for a temporary restraining order [Docket No. #2 ] is DENIED. (2) Steele's motion to extend the deadline to object to the Report and Recommendation [Docket No. #9 ] is GRANTED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/12/2019. (CBC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James J Thomson on behalf of City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota. (Thomson, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Steele re #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time , #11 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Steele, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations filed by Adam Steele.(Steele, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Steele in SUPPORT OF #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Adam Steele.(Steele, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Adam Steele. (Steele, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Adam Steele is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Adam Steele has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER to the Court re:unsigned waiver. (Attachments: #1 Unsigned Waiver, #2 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Adam Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/26/2019. (JLB) cc: Adam Steele. Modified text on 6/26/2019 (MMP).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Adam Steele to Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/21/2019. (CBC) cc: Adam Steele. Modified text on 6/24/2019 (MMP).
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Adam Steele re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/11/2019 (KMH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Steele in SUPPORT OF #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Adam Steele.(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/11/2019 (KMH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Adam Steele. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/11/2019 (KMH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota, Other Unnamed Persons and Entities (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-03598) filed by Adam Steele. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 6th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc:Steele (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/11/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Bemidji, The, Minnesota
Represented By: Abby Jacobson
Represented By: James J Thomson
Represented By: Elizabeth Brodeen-Kuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unnamed Persons and Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?