Ayoka v. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Plaintiff: Antonnio Ayoka and Antonnio C. Ayoka
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Case Number: 0:2019cv01692
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antonnio C. Ayoka. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Strand, Alesia)
June 28, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (KDS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1692 WMW/DTS. (KDS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6963583) filed by Antonnio Ayoka. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Strand, Alesia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayoka v. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonnio Ayoka
Represented By: Alesia R Strand
Represented By: Thomas J Beedem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonnio C. Ayoka
Represented By: Thomas J Beedem, III
Represented By: Alesia R Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?