H.J. Development, Inc. et al v. Continental Western Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Elk River 2006, LLC, Meadow Creek Plaza, LLC, Riverdale 2005, LLC, H.J. Development, Inc., Elk River Crossing, LLC, PPI I,LLC and PPP I, LLC
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company and Continental Western Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01743
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance with attached Certificate of Service by George E. Warner, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Warner, George) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (MMP).
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (SECOND) filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Finn, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-10329 filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Johnson, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/22/2019. (CBC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Kevin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Johnson, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT List re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Johnson, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Westfield Insurance Company.(Johnson, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Johnson, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Johnson, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Finn for Westfield Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/18/2019. (NAH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J. Finn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6996557 filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Johnson, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Thomas J. Finn as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1743 JNE/SER. (CLK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Continental Western Insurance Company Consent to Removal by Continental Western Insurance Company (Kennedy, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westfield Insurance Company (Johnson, Brian) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (CLK).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6972212) filed by Westfield Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, # DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL BE REFILED(2) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Brian) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.J. Development, Inc. et al v. Continental Western Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elk River 2006, LLC
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meadow Creek Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverdale 2005, LLC
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.J. Development, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elk River Crossing, LLC
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPI I,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPP I, LLC
Represented By: Patrick V Johnson
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Represented By: Emily J Streier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian N Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Kerry A Trapp
Represented By: Kevin J Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?