RLI Insurance Company v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: RLI Insurance Company
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01757
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by RLI Insurance Company. (Salveson, Erik)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (Heyerdahl, Lauris)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against RLI Insurance Company. filed by Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (Heyerdahl, Lauris)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Giebel on behalf of Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (Heyerdahl, Lauris) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (kt).
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Smith on behalf of Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (Heyerdahl, Lauris) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (kt).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauris A Heyerdahl on behalf of Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (Heyerdahl, Lauris)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. (KDS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1757 PJS/HB. (KDS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. RLI Corp. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company. BlackRock, Inc., State Street Corporation and The Vanguard Group are publicly-held corporations owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff RLI Corp. (Salveson, Erik) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (kt).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RLI Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6975113) filed by RLI Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Salveson, Erik) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLI Insurance Company v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Erik T Salveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin E Giebel
Represented By: Lauris A Heyerdahl
Represented By: Paul R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?