Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company v. CLAAS of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company
Defendant: CLAAS of America, Inc., CLAAS Omaha Inc. and CLAAS of America Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01767
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION by CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc.. Jointly Signed by Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company a/s/o David and Susan Raguse and CLAAS of America Inc. and CLAAS Omaha Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company. CLAAS Omaha Inc. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Taylor, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. CLAAS North America Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant CLAAS Omaha Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. CLAAS North America Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant CLAAS of America Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick H O'Neill, Jr on behalf of CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc.. (O'Neill, Patrick)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #6 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc..(Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America Inc.. (Bultman, Bradley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company. CLAAS of America Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Taylor, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America, Inc. (KDS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 6th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1767 JNE/LIB. (KDS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLAAS Omaha Inc., CLAAS of America, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6977794) filed by Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company v. CLAAS of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAAS of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAAS Omaha Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H O'Neill, Jr
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAAS of America Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H O'Neill, Jr
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secura Insurance, a Mutual Company
Represented By: David J Taylor
Represented By: Michelle D Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?