Myth Investors, LLC v. GFY Real Estate, LLC
Plaintiff: Myth Investors, LLC
Defendant: GFY Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01772
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Ramsey County Acknowledging receipt of #10 Order of Remand. (KDS) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (KDS). Document QC'd on 8/28/2019 (JGK).
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Ramsey County District Court; enclosing Order of Remand. cc: Ramsey County District Court. (CLK)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/26/2019. (RJE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Thieroff, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Remand Removed Action by Myth Investors, LLC. Jointly Signed by GFY Real Estate, LLC. (Thieroff, Mark) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (CLK).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Mark Thieroff in Support of #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Expedited Hearing Requested filed by Myth Investors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, 2, 4 and 5)(Thieroff, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Myth Investors, LLC.(Thieroff, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Expedited Hearing Requested filed by Myth Investors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thieroff, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Expedited Hearing Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Thieroff, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Expedited Hearing Requested filed by Myth Investors, LLC. (Thieroff, Mark)
July 8, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1772 WMW/DTS. (KDS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-19-3823 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6979577) filed by GFY Real Estate, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petitioner's State Court Motion for Receiver, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Drewes, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myth Investors, LLC v. GFY Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GFY Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan L R Drewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myth Investors, LLC
Represented By: Mark H Thieroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?