Conners v. Bank of America, National Association
Plaintiff: Aleida Conners
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 0:2019cv01806
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aleida Conners (Oman, Brittany)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Bank of America, National Association (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant Bank of America, National Association shall have up to and including August 7, 2019 to plead, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/16/2019. (KJF)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Defend by Bank of America, National Association. Jointly Signed by Aleida Conners. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Anne Oman on behalf of Aleida Conners. (Oman, Brittany)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bank of America Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Bank of America, National Association. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1806 MJD/ECW. (kt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number Not know. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6987675) filed by Bank of America, National Association. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) 3) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Kaluza, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conners v. Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleida Conners
Represented By: Brittany Anne Oman
Represented By: Ryan T Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?