Howard v. Cheever et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Howard
Defendant: Janice Williams, Pamela J. Rogers, Keran C. Stewart, Breena K. Efferetz and Shane L. Cheever
Case Number: 0:2019cv01807
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 Objection. (KDS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION re #7 Order Referring All Dispositive and Non-Dispositive Motions to Magistrate Judge filed by Joseph Howard. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Envelope)(KDS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Rau. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/6/2019. (RJE) cc: Howard. (kt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Howard re #5 Exhibit, #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(kt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Howard.(kt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISMISSAL filed by Joseph Howard. (kt)
July 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Howard with Practice Pointers. (kt)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1807 (WMW/SER). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/22/2019. (lmb) cc: Joseph Howard. Modified text on 7/22/2019 (lmb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Shane L. Cheever, Breena K. Efferetz, Pamela J. Rogers, Keran C. Stewart, Janice Williams. (JGK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shane L. Cheever, Breena K. Efferetz, Pamela J. Rogers, Keran C. Stewart, Janice Williams (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-103850) filed by Joseph Howard. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd - 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JGK) cc: Howard (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Cheever et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keran C. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breena K. Efferetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane L. Cheever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?