Saari v. Bjorklund et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Saari
Defendant: Angelika Christopher, Renae Kass and Gary Bjorklund
Case Number: 0:2019cv01814
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/4/2019. (MSK) cc: Saari. Modified text on 9/4/2019 (MKB).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/23/2019. (Sadkovich, James) cc:Joseph Thomas Saari. Modified text on 7/23/2019 (MMG).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Thomas Saari re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Thomas Saari (JGK) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 8/21/2019 (KMH).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Thomas Saari. (JGK) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 8/21/2019 (KMH).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Gary Bjorklund, Angelika Christopher, Renae Kass filed by Joseph Thomas Saari. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Saari. Document QC'd by KMH on 8/21/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saari v. Bjorklund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Saari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelika Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renae Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bjorklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?