Goodman v. Economy Premier Assurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Malka L. Goodman
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. and Economy Premier Assurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01815
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/7/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/28/2019. (TMA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/01/2019; Fact Discovery due by 05/01/2020; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 05/01/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 06/01/2020; Ready For Trial by 08/01/2020. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 08/27/2019. (LLM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/27/2019. Present: Jenneane Jansen for Plaintiff; Joseph Lulic for Defendants. (ct20min) (JEP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Malka L. Goodman. Jointly Signed by Dr. Malka L. Goodman, Economy Premier Assurance Company, and MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc..(Jansen, Jenneane)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE of Resetting of Initial Pretrial Conference: #6 Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 RESET for 8/27/2019 at 01:50 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:40 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Economy Premier Assurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Lulic, Joseph)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1815 PAM/ECW. (kt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-19-4779 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6990303) filed by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Economy Premier Assurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) A-D to Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lulic, Joseph)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-19-4779 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6990223) filed by MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Economy Premier Assurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D to Summons & Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lulic, Joseph) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Economy Premier Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Malka L. Goodman
Represented By: Jenneane L Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?