DeLeon v. Rios
Petitioner: Alfredo DeLeon
Respondent: Warden M. Rios
Case Number: 0:2019cv01834
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #8 Reply to Response to Petitioner for Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) filed by Alfredo DeLeon.(KNK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO PETITIONER FOR PETITIONER FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2241 re #5 Response filed by Alfredo DeLeon.(KNK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Warden M. Rios re #6 Declaration, #5 Response (Tweeten, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Tawana Ingram re #5 Response by Warden M. Rios . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Tweeten, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Warden M. Rios.(Tweeten, Andrew)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/17/2019. (TJB) cc:Alfredo DeLeon. Modified text on 7/19/2019 (MMG). Modified text on 7/25/2019 (MMG).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of Warden M. Rios. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Alfredo DeLeon. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Alfredo DeLeon Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Division - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)A-H, #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: DeLeon. Modified text on 7/12/2019 (JGK). Modified text on 7/16/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLeon v. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden M. Rios
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfredo DeLeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?