Collins v. Barr
Petitioner: Randolph Collins
Respondent: William P. Barr
Case Number: 0:2019cv01848
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr re #6 Declaration, #5 Response (Siekert, Friedrich)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Richard N. Pryd Jr. re #5 Response by William P. Barr . (Siekert, Friedrich)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William P. Barr. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Siekert, Friedrich)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Respondent to file answer within 20 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/2/2019. (HAM) cc: Randolph Collins. Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of William P. Barr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Siekert, Friedrich)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Randolph Collins. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randolph Collins. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd/4th Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK)cc: Collins Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randolph Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?