Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc. v. Beg
Plaintiff: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.
Defendant: Mirza Asif Beg
Case Number: 0:2019cv01852
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Mirza Asif Beg answer due 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/4/2019. (HAM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Holland, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stip to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Mirza Asif Beg. Jointly Signed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. (Holland, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Holland on behalf of Mirza Asif Beg. (Holland, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Mirza Asif Beg served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Miller, Craig)
July 17, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mirza Asif Beg. (KDS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1852 WMW/TNL. (KDS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Radisson Hospitality, Inc. (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (CLK).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mirza Asif Beg (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6996735) filed by Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc. v. Beg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirza Asif Beg
Represented By: John D Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Represented By: Kirk W Reilly
Represented By: Olivia Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?