Abdi v. Saul
Plaintiff: Suaad Abdi
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01854
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suaad Abdi. Andrew Saul served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (KNK)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MMG)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/16/2019. (TJB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (lmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1854 (DTS). (lmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Suaad Abdi. (Schneider, Mac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Suaad Abdi. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schneider, Mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdi v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suaad Abdi
Represented By: Mac Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?