Wandler v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Justin Wandler
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01868
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Justin Wandler re: Resolution of Claims. (Hartz, Bennett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 (Text-only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Pretrial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/16/2019 at 2:30 PM will be held via telephone. Call-in instructions will be emailed to parties. (MME)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colin C. Poling for Trans Union, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/25/2019. (NAH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin C. Poling. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7017879 filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. TransUnion is a corporate parent of Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1868 (NEB/SER). (lmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6999310) filed by Trans Union, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wandler v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Colin C. Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wandler
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: curtis C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?