Gapen v. Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gapen
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01876
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Gapen. Hunter Warfield, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ryder, Randall)
July 18, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hunter Warfield, Inc.. (kt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1876 NEB/HB. (kt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunter Warfield, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7000840) filed by Kimberly Gapen. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ryder, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gapen v. Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gapen
Represented By: Randall P Ryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?