Rogan v. Gau
Plaintiff: Michael Guy. Rogan
Defendant: Collin M. Gau
Case Number: 0:2019cv01882
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
2 Judge: Steven E Rau
3 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-only) ORDER Upon review of the Motion #3 , and Memorandum #4 , the Court instructs the Clerk's Office to strike these items as FILED IN ERROR. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/30/2019. (JLB) cc: NEF to Michael Guy. Rogan. Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1882 (PJS/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/19/2019, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/22/2019 and Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/24/2019. cc: Rogan.(MMP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR Per Order 6 filed 08/30/2019. MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION filed by Michael Guy. Rogan.(JGK) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR Per Order 6 filed 08/30/2019. MOTION filed by Michael Guy. Rogan. (JGK) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Guy. Rogan. (JGK)Document QC'd on 8/2/2019 (MMG).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Collin M. Gau filed by Michael Guy. Rogan. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Discovery, #3 Exhibit(s) Blank Forms, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Rogan. Document QC'd on 8/2/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogan v. Gau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Guy. Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin M. Gau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?