Moore v. Fikes
Petitioner: James E. Moore
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2019cv01951
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James E. Moore, and #4 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by James E. Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/17/2019. (JMK) cc: James E. Moore. Modified text on 9/17/2019 (MMP).
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT MOTION TO DENY 28:2241 PETITION FOR RELIEF filed by James Eric Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd 9/11/19 by KMW.
August 13, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) cc: NEF and Copy of Practice Pointers mailed to James E. Moore. Modified text on 8/13/2019 (lmb).
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fikes re #12 Response, #13 Declaration, (Blumenfield, Chad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Dawn Giddings re #12 Response by Fikes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Blumenfield, Chad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 Exhibit, #4 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Fikes. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blumenfield, Chad)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/8/2019. (KLL) cc: James E. Moore. Modified text on 8/12/2019 (lmb).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER in Response to #6 Request. Respondent shall have up to and including August 12, 2019 to respond to Petitioner's proposed amended petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/7/2019. (KLL) cc:James E. Moore. Modified text on 8/8/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fikes re #7 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Request (Blumenfield, Chad)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James E. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH).
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request #6 Request. (Blumenfield, Chad)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clarification or in the Alternative to Extend time to Respond to Amended Petition by Fikes. (Blumenfield, Chad)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION to Amend 28:2241 Petition filed by James Moore.(MMP) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to amend 28:2241 petition with additional documents filed by James E. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition within ten days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/26/2019. (ALM) cc:James E. Moore. Modified text on 7/29/2019 (MMG).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James E. Moore. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Appendix A, #3 Envelope) cc: Moore (MMP) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?