United States of America v. $39,694 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $39,694 in U.S. Currency and 2006 Black Lexis GX470 with VIN: JTJBT20X860104573
Claimant: Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01984
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr. (Durkin, Rory)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 TRIAL EXHIBIT Typical Auto Transaction 3 re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Claim. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr., #6 Claim filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr..(Durkin, Rory)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 TRIAL EXHIBIT Typical Auto Transaction #2 re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Claim. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr., #6 Claim filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr..(Durkin, Rory)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 TRIAL EXHIBIT Typical Auto Transaction re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Claim. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr., #6 Claim filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr..(Durkin, Rory)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 TRIAL EXHIBIT PI Settlement Conference re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Claim. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr., #6 Claim filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr..(Durkin, Rory)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) PI Settlement Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Bank Records, #3 Exhibit(s) Auto Invoices, #4 Exhibit(s) Transactions & Checks) (Durkin, Rory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified Claim filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Settlement Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Bank Records, #3 Exhibit(s) Manheim Invoices, #4 Exhibit(s) Checks & Transactions)(Durkin, Rory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - Verified Claim ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenneth (NMN) Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Settlement Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Bank Records, #3 Exhibit(s) Manheim Invoices, #4 Exhibit(s) Checks & Transactions) (Durkin, Rory) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (KNK).
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Patrick Durkin on behalf of Kenneth (NMN) Johnson. (Durkin, Rory)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $39,694 in U.S. Currency and 2006 Black Lexis GX470 with VIN: JTJBT20X860104573. (MMP) Document QC'd 9/11/19 by KMW.
July 29, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1984 (DWF/SER). (MMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for FORFEITURE IN REM against $39,694 in U.S. Currency, 2006 Black Lexis GX470 with VIN: JTJBT20X860104573 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudleston, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $39,694 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $39,694 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Black Lexis GX470 with VIN: JTJBT20X860104573
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Hudleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth (NMN) Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Rory Patrick Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?