United States of America v. FilmTec Corporation
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: FilmTec Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv01985
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/23/2019. (DLO)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by United States of America.(Ricci, Samantha)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Unopposed filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ricci, Samantha)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Unopposed with Certificate of Service filed by United States of America. (Ricci, Samantha) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (KDS).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/31/2019. (CLB)
July 27, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1985 DSD/SER. (CLK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(Ricci, Samantha)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FilmTec Corporation filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ricci, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. FilmTec Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FilmTec Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha Morgan Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?