Martinez Vazquez v. TL Edina LLC et al
Plaintiff: Esteban Martinez Vazquez
Defendant: St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC, Diana Martinez-Herrera, TL Edina LLC, Adrian Ramirez and Diana Martinez Herrera
Case Number: 0:2019cv02006
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera.(Ballintine, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #22 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera.(Ballintine, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ballintine, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Ballintine, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera. (Ballintine, Daniel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Joint ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Diana Martinez Herrera, Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC. (Ballintine, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General . (Ballintine, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint, #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Esteban Martinez Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lawlyes, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Esteban Martinez Vazquez. No summons requested. (Lawlyes, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC. (Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint filed by Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC.(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC.(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint filed by Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General and Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint filed by Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC. (Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera.(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera.(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Ballintine, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Diana Martinez Herrera. (Ballintine, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esteban Martinez Vazquez. Diana Martinez Herrera served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Adrian Ramirez served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; TL Edina LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; TL Enterprise 1 LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Gavigan, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Esteban Martinez Vazquez by Esteban Martinez Vazquez for consent to participate in FLSA action. (Gavigan, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Diana Martinez Herrera, Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC, Adrian Ramirez, St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC, TL Edina LLC, TL Enterprise 1 LLC. (kt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 180cv02996 ECT/DTS. (kt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Gavigan on behalf of Esteban Martinez Vazquez. (Gavigan, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7030789) filed by Esteban Martinez Vazquez. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gavigan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Vazquez v. TL Edina LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Hospitality Systems LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mpls Hospitality Systems LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL Enterprise 1 LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Martinez-Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL Edina LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Ramirez
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Martinez Herrera
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Daniel J Ballintine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Martinez Vazquez
Represented By: Michael D Gavigan
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?