Barry Law Office, Ltd, The v. Ark Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Barry Law Office, Ltd, The
Defendant: Ark Financial LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02037
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0252
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Action dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (DLO)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barry Law Office, Ltd, The (Lyons, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON CORPORATE REPRESENTATION. No attorney has entered an appearance on behalf of Defendant. On or before October 11, 2019, Defendant Ark Financial Services, LLC, must appear and answer through licensed counsel duly authorized to practice in this District, failing which it may be subject to entry of default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/11/2019. (JMK). cc: Ark Financial, LLC. Modified text on 9/11/2019 (MTP).
August 29, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ark Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/5/2019. (CLB)
August 1, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (KLL)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ark Financial LLC. (lmb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2037 (DSD/HB). (lmb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) WITH JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Ark Financial LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7031766) filed by Barry Law Office, Ltd, The. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry Law Office, Ltd, The v. Ark Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Law Office, Ltd, The
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ark Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?