Chamberlain Home Owners Association v. Rainbow House, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chamberlain Home Owners Association
Defendant: Carl Green, John Doe, Mary Roe and Rainbow House, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02050
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of State Court Filings by Carl Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MKB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF TRESSPASS LETTER by Carl Green (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/19/2019 (NAH).
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Carl Green re #24 Reply byCarl Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/12/2019 (CLK).
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/12/2019 (CLK).
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamberlain Home Owners Association re #22 Reply to Response to Motion (Mendez, Nigel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 Reply to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mendez, Nigel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION TO REMAND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF by Carl Green re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 REMOVAL CORRESPONDENCE AND DOCUMENTS by Carl Green (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green.(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion for TRO filed by Carl Green.(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green. (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamberlain Home Owners Association re #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #13 Declaration in Opposition, (Mendez, Nigel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Nigel H Mendez in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association.(Mendez, Nigel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mendez, Nigel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association.(Mendez, Nigel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association.(Mendez, Nigel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Nigel H Mendez in Support of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mendez, Nigel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mendez, Nigel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mendez, Nigel)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Schultz. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/6/2019. (SMD) cc: Carl Green. Modified text on 8/7/2019 (lmb).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamberlain Home Owners Association re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Mendez, Nigel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chamberlain Home Owners Association. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENTS. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Declaration of Nigel Mendez, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 proposed Order, #6 Meet and Confer, #7 Word Count)(Mendez, Nigel) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (lmb).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green.(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/8/2019 (NAH).
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Carl Green. (MMG) Document QC'd on 8/8/2019 (NAH).
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, case number 82-CV-19-2948 (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-15648) filed by Carl Green. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Removal Correspondence and Documents, #4 Correspondence to Chief Judge Douglas Meslow, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmb) cc: Carl Green. Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain Home Owners Association v. Rainbow House, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamberlain Home Owners Association
Represented By: Nigel H Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?