Cap v. MyLife.com
Plaintiff: Allyson Cap
Defendant: MyLife.com
Case Number: 0:2019cv02056
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Allyson Cap. (Madgett, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Defendant has filed a Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint to September 18, 2019 (ECF 20). It is unclear whether Plaintiff opposes the Motion. Plaintiff shall file a letter on CM/ECF by 3:00 p.m. on Friday, September 13, 2019, stating whether Plaintiff intends to oppose the Motion. If Plaintiff intends to oppose the Motion, her brief in opposition is due on September 18, 2019. See D. Minn. LR 7.1(b)(2). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2019. (TMA)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by MyLife.com.(Wheeler, Brandon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Date and time to be determined. (Wheeler, Brandon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by MyLife.com. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wheeler, Brandon)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #17 Stipulation. MyLife.com answer or otherwise respond due date: 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/6/2019. (TMA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Wheeler, Brandon)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MyLife.com. Jointly Signed by Allyson Cap. (Wheeler, Brandon)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. MyLife.com answer or otherwise respond due date: 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/3/2019. (TMA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MyLife.com. Jointly Signed by Allyson Cap. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. MyLife.com answer or otherwise respond due date: 8/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/22/2019. (TMA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MyLife.com. Jointly Signed by Allyson Cap. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant MyLife.com. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Raj N. Shah for MyLife.com; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emily Danya Gilman for MyLife.com; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric M. Roberts for MyLife.com. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/8/2019. (NAH)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/7/2019. (SGK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric M. Roberts. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7056472 filed by MyLife.com. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily Gilman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7056441 filed by MyLife.com. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raj N. Shah. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7056407 filed by MyLife.com. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Voelbel, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MyLife.com. Jointly Signed by Allyson Cap. (Voelbel, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2056 (JRT/ECW). (lmb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7033327) filed by MyLife.com. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wheeler, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cap v. MyLife.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyson Cap
Represented By: David J S Madgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyLife.com
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Richard R Voelbel
Represented By: Emily Danya Gilman
Represented By: Raj N. Shah
Represented By: Eric M. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?