Redden v. Linder et al
Plaintiff: Judith A. Redden
Defendant: Meyer Njus Tanick, P.A. and Steven A. Linder
Case Number: 0:2019cv02072
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/10/2019. (RMM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steven A. Linder, Meyer Njus Tanick, P.A. (Robbins, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Robbins on behalf of All Defendants. (Robbins, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss. (Robbins, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven A. Linder, Meyer Njus Tanick, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Meet and Confer Statement)(Robbins, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2072 ECT/KMM. (kt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven A. Linder, Meyer Njus Tanick, PA re #1 Notice of Removal, (Robbins, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Meyer Njus Tanick, PA. (Robbins, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7036085) filed by Meyer Njus Tanick, PA. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbins, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redden v. Linder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer Njus Tanick, P.A.
Represented By: James M Njus
Represented By: David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Linder
Represented By: James M Njus
Represented By: David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Redden
Represented By: Mitchell R Hadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?