Weisen v. Slumberland Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: Slumberland Inc. and Larson Enterprises
Case Number: 0:2019cv02076
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/26/2019. (SMD)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Per counsel, the matter has settled and a stipulation for dismissal will be filed. The Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is canceled. (MSK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing, TIME CHANGE ONLY: The Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 will begin at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th - Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations/ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2076 SRN/BRT. (kt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Inc.. (Sicoli, Amanda)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-12991 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7037061) filed by Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sicoli, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. Slumberland Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slumberland Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larson Enterprises
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?