Kasim v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abdullahi Kasim
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02084
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. filed by Abdullahi Kasim. No summons requested. (Peterson, Ryan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/11/2019. (TMA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #1 Consent Form (TMA). Modified text on 9/12/2019 (MMP).
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/7/2019. (SGK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Abdullahi Kasim. (Myers, Gregory)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allison Leigh McQueen for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/6/2019. (NAH)
August 5, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Allison L. McQueen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (MMP) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP).
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2084 (WMW/ECW). (MMP)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison McQueen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7038519, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Myers, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison McQueen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7038519 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7038491) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasim v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullahi Kasim
Represented By: Ryan D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Represented By: Allison Leigh McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?