Carlone v. City of St. Paul et al
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Carlone
Defendant: Steven Heng, St. Paul, City of and City of St. Paul
Case Number: 0:2019cv02118
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb) cc: Patrick A. Carlone.
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, the Court will ADOPT the Report and Recommendation #7 in its entirety. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). 2. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Patrick A. Carlone #4 is DENIED. 3. Carlone's motion for an injunction #3 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/18/2019. (GRR) cc: Patrick A. Carlone. Modified text on 9/19/2019 (lmb).
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Patrick A. Carlone. (lmb) Document QC'd on 9/3/2019 (NAH).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Patrick A. Carlone, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Patrick A. Carlone, #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Patrick A. Carlone filed by Patrick A. Carlone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/23/2019. (MME) cc: Carlone. Modified text on 8/26/2019 (KDS).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Patrick A. Carlone to Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/8/2019. (GRR) cc: Carlone. Modified text on 8/9/2019 (KDS).
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 PETITIONERS SUPPORTING FACTS by Patrick A. Carlone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(kt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Patrick A. Carlone. (kt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Patrick A. Carlone. (kt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Patrick A. Carlone. (kt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Heng, St. Paul, City of filed by Patrick A. Carlone. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt)cc: Carlone. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlone v. City of St. Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Heng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Carlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?