State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Backowski et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota, St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota, Father Joseph Backowski, Diocese of St. Cloud, Vicar General Robert E. Rolfes, St. Thomas Catholic Church, Theodosia Orlando and St. Mary
Case Number: 0:2019cv02135
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert E. Rolfes. (Gunderson, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota. (Gunderson, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota. (Gunderson, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Diocese of St. Cloud. (Gunderson, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gunderson and Thomas B Wieser on behalf of Robert E. Rolfes. (Gunderson, John) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (KDS).
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gunderson and Thomas B Wieser on behalf of St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota. (Gunderson, John) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (KDS).
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gunderson and Thomas B Wieser on behalf of St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota. (Gunderson, John) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (KDS).
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gunderson and Thomas B Wieser on behalf of Diocese of St. Cloud. (Gunderson, John) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (KDS).
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Joseph Backowski. (Engh, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C Engh on behalf of Joseph Backowski. (Engh, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Theodosia Orlando. (Bryant, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Joseph Backowski served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; Robert E. Rolfes served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Pham, Lehoan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Diocese of St. Cloud served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Theodosia Orlando served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Pham, Lehoan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by C Todd Koebele on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Koebele, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joseph Backowski, Diocese of St. Cloud, Theodosia Orlando, Robert E. Rolfes, St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota, St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota. (CLK)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2135 SRN/LIB. (CLK)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pham, Lehoan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7051125) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pham, Lehoan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Backowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Mary of the Presentation Church, Breckenridge, Minnesota
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Thomas Aquinas Church, Kent, Minnesota
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Father Joseph Backowski
Represented By: Paul C Engh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diocese of St. Cloud
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicar General Robert E. Rolfes
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Thomas Catholic Church
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodosia Orlando
Represented By: Michael A Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Mary
Represented By: Thomas B Wieser
Represented By: John C Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Lehoan T. Pham
Represented By: C Todd Koebele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?