U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02148
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Miles Shultz for U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/12/2019. (NAH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Miles Shultz filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Banaszak, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Banaszak, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Elizabeth B. Banaszak for U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/7/2019. (NAH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. (kt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2148 JNE/SER. (kt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Elizabeth B. Banaszak filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Vasichek, Laurie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vasichek, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Banaszak
Represented By: Laurie A Vasichek
Represented By: Miles Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?