Now Micro, Inc. v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Now Micro, Inc.
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation, NHK Spring Co. Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., Hutchinson Technology Inc., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., Headway Technologies, Inc., NHK International Corporation and NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02196
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases that 19cv2419 SRN/DTS and 19cv2570 SRN/DTS have been reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/25/2019.(MTP)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases that 19cv2406 JNE/ECW and 19cv2531 DSD/LIB have been reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/20/2019, by Judge Joan N Ericksen on 9/23/2019, by Judge David S. Doty on 9/23/2019. (MTP) Modified text on 9/24/2019 (MTP).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #18 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/20/2019. (JRE)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/20/2019. (ACH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Sims, Victoria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service by Now Micro, Inc. Jointly signed by NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd, NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd. (Sims, Victoria) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (CLK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Now Micro, Inc.. NHK International Corporation served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Raiter, Shawn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Now Micro, Inc.. Hutchinson Technology Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Raiter, Shawn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Now Micro, Inc.. Headway Technologies, Inc. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Raiter, Shawn)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/13/2019. (HAM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Sims, Victoria)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service by Now Micro, Inc. Jointly signed by Hutchinson Technology, Inc., Headway Technologies, Inc., TDK Corporation, Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd. (Sims, Victoria) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (CLK).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 19-cv-2357 NEB/ECT has been reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/28/2019. (KDS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Now Micro, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(lmb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Now Micro, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Watson Cuneo for Now Micro, Inc.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Victoria Sims for Now Micro, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/15/2019. (NAH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Victoria Sims. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7081567 filed by Now Micro, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Cuneo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7081550 filed by Now Micro, Inc.. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jonathan W. Cuneo, Victoria Sims, Joel Davidow, Daniel Cohen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TDK Corporation. (kt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co. Ltd., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.. (kt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2196 ECT/TNL. (kt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7072235) filed by Now Micro, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raiter, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Now Micro, Inc. v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headway Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Now Micro, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Represented By: Victoria Sims
Represented By: Jonathan Watson Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?